California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB124 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 4, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 27, 2009
Bill April 30, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009