LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB124
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB124
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB124
Compare Versions
SB124 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB124 Enrolled September 8, 2009
SB124 Amended August 27, 2009
SB124 Amended April 30, 2009
SB124 Amended April 13, 2009
SB124 Introduced February 4, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB124 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB124 Enrolled September 8, 2009
SB124 Amended August 27, 2009
SB124 Amended April 30, 2009
SB124 Amended April 13, 2009
SB124 Introduced February 4, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare