|
10/23/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 635, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/23/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2518.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 7. Page 3069.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 972.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 555.)
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 339.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/05/2009
|
Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|