LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB132
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB132
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB132
Compare Versions
SB132 Chaptered October 23, 2009
SB132 Enrolled October 14, 2009
SB132 Amended August 31, 2009
SB132 Amended July 6, 2009
SB132 Amended June 24, 2009
SB132 Amended May 14, 2009
SB132 Amended April 27, 2009
SB132 Introduced February 9, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB132 Chaptered October 23, 2009
SB132 Enrolled October 14, 2009
SB132 Amended August 31, 2009
SB132 Amended July 6, 2009
SB132 Amended June 24, 2009
SB132 Amended May 14, 2009
SB132 Amended April 27, 2009
SB132 Introduced February 9, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare