California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB132 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 9, 2009

Enrolled

Bill October 14, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 23, 2009

Amended

Bill August 31, 2009
Bill July 6, 2009
Bill June 24, 2009
Bill May 14, 2009
Bill April 27, 2009