|
09/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4944.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 6243.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6102.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 14.)
|
|
|
|
06/03/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 3706.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2010
|
Set for hearing May 17.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2010
|
Set for hearing May 10.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 3311.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/04/2010
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/21/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
|
|
|
|
02/19/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|