California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1348 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 19, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Amended

Bill August 9, 2010
Bill June 17, 2010
Bill May 24, 2010
Bill May 18, 2010
Bill April 14, 2010