LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1348
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1348
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1348
Compare Versions
SB1348 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB1348 Amended August 9, 2010
SB1348 Amended June 17, 2010
SB1348 Amended May 24, 2010
SB1348 Amended May 18, 2010
SB1348 Amended April 14, 2010
SB1348 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1348 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB1348 Amended August 9, 2010
SB1348 Amended June 17, 2010
SB1348 Amended May 24, 2010
SB1348 Amended May 18, 2010
SB1348 Amended April 14, 2010
SB1348 Introduced February 19, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare