|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1:45 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 13. Page 2440.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 3393.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on September 9.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3152.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 3041.) Re-referred to Com. On U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice (Com. on U. & C.) suspended. (Ayes 46. Noes 25. Page 2335.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Coms. on U. & C. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 374.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 332.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file. Set for hearing March 23.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing March 16. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/03/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 250.) Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/23/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee. Set for hearing March 3.
|
|
|
|
02/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/14/2009
|
Set for hearing February 23.
|
|
|
|
02/10/2009
|
Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2009
|
Set for hearing February 10.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Coms. on E., U. & C. and RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U. & C. Set for hearing February 3.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|