LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB14
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB14
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 1, 2008
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
September 15, 2009
Compare
Amended
Bill
September 10, 2009
Compare
Bill
September 4, 2009
Compare
Bill
August 18, 2009
Compare
Bill
July 14, 2009
Compare
Bill
June 23, 2009
Compare
Bill
March 24, 2009
Compare
Bill
March 12, 2009
Compare
Bill
February 17, 2009
Compare
Bill
January 29, 2009
Compare