LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB14
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB14
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB14
Compare Versions
SB14 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB14 Amended September 10, 2009
SB14 Amended September 4, 2009
SB14 Amended August 18, 2009
SB14 Amended July 14, 2009
SB14 Amended June 23, 2009
SB14 Amended March 24, 2009
SB14 Amended March 12, 2009
SB14 Amended February 17, 2009
SB14 Amended January 29, 2009
SB14 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 1 (Old)
SB14 Enrolled September 15, 2009
SB14 Amended September 10, 2009
SB14 Amended September 4, 2009
SB14 Amended August 18, 2009
SB14 Amended July 14, 2009
SB14 Amended June 23, 2009
SB14 Amended March 24, 2009
SB14 Amended March 12, 2009
SB14 Amended February 17, 2009
SB14 Amended January 29, 2009
SB14 Introduced December 1, 2008
Version 2 (New)
Compare