|
09/24/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 297, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4644.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 4505.)
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Set for hearing August 12.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4391.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6056.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/03/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in Committee on June 17.) From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3412.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3357.)
|
|
|
|
03/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after April 8.
|
|
|
|
03/08/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|