California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB1482 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 17, 2010
Bill June 7, 2010