LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1482
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB1482
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB1482
Compare Versions
SB1482 Chaptered September 24, 2010
SB1482 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB1482 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1482 Amended June 17, 2010
SB1482 Amended June 7, 2010
SB1482 Introduced March 8, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB1482 Chaptered September 24, 2010
SB1482 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB1482 Amended August 2, 2010
SB1482 Amended June 17, 2010
SB1482 Amended June 7, 2010
SB1482 Introduced March 8, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare