|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 46, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2544.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Coms. on PUB. S. and HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1149.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 1026.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26. (For vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 705.)
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 497.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/09/2009
|
To Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|