LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB352
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB352
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB352
Compare Versions
SB352 Chaptered August 6, 2009
SB352 Enrolled July 17, 2009
SB352 Amended May 28, 2009
SB352 Amended April 30, 2009
SB352 Amended April 16, 2009
SB352 Amended April 13, 2009
SB352 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB352 Chaptered August 6, 2009
SB352 Enrolled July 17, 2009
SB352 Amended May 28, 2009
SB352 Amended April 30, 2009
SB352 Amended April 16, 2009
SB352 Amended April 13, 2009
SB352 Introduced February 25, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare