California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB352 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2009

Enrolled

Bill July 17, 2009

Chaptered

Bill August 6, 2009

Amended

Bill May 28, 2009
Bill April 30, 2009
Bill April 16, 2009
Bill April 13, 2009