|
09/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 5035.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 67. Noes 8. Page 6824.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6427.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B.,P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 1183.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From inactive file to second reading file. Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Negrete McLeod.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 580.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 807.) Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|