California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB427 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2010

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill August 9, 2010
Bill May 20, 2010
Bill June 22, 2009
Bill June 1, 2009
Bill April 23, 2009
Bill April 2, 2009