LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB427
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB427
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB427
Compare Versions
SB427 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB427 Amended August 20, 2010
SB427 Amended August 9, 2010
SB427 Amended May 20, 2010
SB427 Amended June 22, 2009
SB427 Amended June 1, 2009
SB427 Amended April 23, 2009
SB427 Amended April 2, 2009
SB427 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB427 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB427 Amended August 20, 2010
SB427 Amended August 9, 2010
SB427 Amended May 20, 2010
SB427 Amended June 22, 2009
SB427 Amended June 1, 2009
SB427 Amended April 23, 2009
SB427 Amended April 2, 2009
SB427 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare