|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 502, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 4946.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4693.)
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4565.) Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 6257.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6175.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar. From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
02/11/2010
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 2733.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/26/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 2694.)
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Set for hearing January 21. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
01/12/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 637.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|