California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB442 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 12, 2010
Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 22, 2010
Bill January 26, 2010
Bill January 12, 2010
Bill May 6, 2009
Bill April 28, 2009
Bill April 15, 2009