LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB442
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB442
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB442
Compare Versions
SB442 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB442 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB442 Amended August 12, 2010
SB442 Amended August 2, 2010
SB442 Amended June 22, 2010
SB442 Amended January 26, 2010
SB442 Amended January 12, 2010
SB442 Amended May 6, 2009
SB442 Amended April 28, 2009
SB442 Amended April 15, 2009
SB442 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB442 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB442 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB442 Amended August 12, 2010
SB442 Amended August 2, 2010
SB442 Amended June 22, 2010
SB442 Amended January 26, 2010
SB442 Amended January 12, 2010
SB442 Amended May 6, 2009
SB442 Amended April 28, 2009
SB442 Amended April 15, 2009
SB442 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare