|
09/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/23/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4656.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 6247.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/06/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/18/2010
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1971.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2009
|
Set for hearing August 17.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1644.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Set for hearing July 2.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2009
|
Set for hearing June 30.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
Testimony taken. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2009
|
Set for hearing June 16.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
Set for hearing June 9.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|