LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB474
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB474
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB474
Compare Versions
SB474 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB474 Amended August 2, 2010
SB474 Amended August 24, 2009
SB474 Amended July 9, 2009
SB474 Amended June 3, 2009
SB474 Amended May 21, 2009
SB474 Amended April 27, 2009
SB474 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB474 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB474 Amended August 2, 2010
SB474 Amended August 24, 2009
SB474 Amended July 9, 2009
SB474 Amended June 3, 2009
SB474 Amended May 21, 2009
SB474 Amended April 27, 2009
SB474 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare