California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB474 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill August 24, 2009
Bill July 9, 2009
Bill June 3, 2009
Bill May 21, 2009
Bill April 27, 2009