|
10/19/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 716, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
10/19/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/13/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2010
|
In Senate. Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 28. Noes 2. Page 5253.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
10/08/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file. Read third time. Amended. (Page 7173.) To third reading. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 4. Page 7174.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1149.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 679.)
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
03/31/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|