LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB524
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB524
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB524
Compare Versions
SB524 Chaptered October 19, 2010
SB524 Enrolled October 11, 2010
SB524 Amended October 8, 2010
SB524 Amended July 7, 2009
SB524 Amended May 28, 2009
SB524 Amended April 29, 2009
SB524 Amended March 31, 2009
SB524 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB524 Chaptered October 19, 2010
SB524 Enrolled October 11, 2010
SB524 Amended October 8, 2010
SB524 Amended July 7, 2009
SB524 Amended May 28, 2009
SB524 Amended April 29, 2009
SB524 Amended March 31, 2009
SB524 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare