LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB524
Draft Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB524
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB524
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 27, 2009
Compare
Enrolled
Bill
October 11, 2010
Compare
Chaptered
Bill
October 19, 2010
Compare
Amended
Bill
October 8, 2010
Compare
Bill
July 7, 2009
Compare
Bill
May 28, 2009
Compare
Bill
April 29, 2009
Compare
Bill
March 31, 2009
Compare