|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 556, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 5004.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 24. Page 6755.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6423.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 13. Page 2726.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 586.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|