LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB657
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB657
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB657
Compare Versions
SB657 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB657 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB657 Amended August 20, 2010
SB657 Amended June 30, 2010
SB657 Amended June 23, 2010
SB657 Amended June 1, 2009
SB657 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB657 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB657 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB657 Amended August 20, 2010
SB657 Amended June 30, 2010
SB657 Amended June 23, 2010
SB657 Amended June 1, 2009
SB657 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare