California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB657 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 20, 2010
Bill June 30, 2010
Bill June 23, 2010
Bill June 1, 2009