|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 625, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 29. Noes 0. Page 4447.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 6106.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2010
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2704.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2665.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/08/2010
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2010
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
12/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 702.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
To Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|