LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB677
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB677
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB677
Compare Versions
SB677 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB677 Enrolled August 12, 2010
SB677 Amended June 10, 2010
SB677 Amended December 17, 2009
SB677 Amended May 19, 2009
SB677 Amended May 14, 2009
SB677 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB677 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB677 Enrolled August 12, 2010
SB677 Amended June 10, 2010
SB677 Amended December 17, 2009
SB677 Amended May 19, 2009
SB677 Amended May 14, 2009
SB677 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare