BILL NUMBER: SB 677CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 625 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 30, 2010 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 11, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 9, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY JUNE 10, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE DECEMBER 17, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 19, 2009 AMENDED IN SENATE MAY 14, 2009 INTRODUCED BY Senator Yee (Coauthors: Senators Alquist, Cox, and DeSaulnier) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Blumenfield, DeVore, Hill, Lieu, Miller, Portantino, Silva, Smyth, Solorio, Audra Strickland, and Tran) FEBRUARY 27, 2009 An act to add Section 236.3 to the Penal Code, relating to human trafficking. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 677, Yee. Human trafficking: property: seizure. Existing law defines human trafficking as the deprivation or violation of the personal liberty of another person with the intent to commit certain specified sex offenses with the person or to obtain forced labor or services, as specified. This bill would authorize real property used to facilitate the commission of that offense to be declared and treated as a nuisance, as specified. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 236.3 is added to the Penal Code, to read: 236.3. Upon conviction of a violation of Section 236.1, if real property is used to facilitate the commission of the offense, the procedures for determining whether the property constitutes a nuisance and the remedies imposed therefor as provided in Article 2 (commencing with Section 11225) of Chapter 3 of Title 1 of Part 4 shall apply.