|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 619, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 3. Page 4976.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4953.)
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4761.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 4. Page 6354.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69 (d) suspended. (Page 6303.)
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6233.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/14/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Heard in committee on April 12.)
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 4550.) Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
04/06/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 3042.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 14. Page 515.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
01/29/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
01/22/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after February 20.
|
|
|
|
01/20/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|