California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB82 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2010

Amended

Bill August 16, 2010
Bill June 14, 2010
Bill April 8, 2010
Bill September 4, 2009