LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB82
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB82
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB82
Compare Versions
SB82 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB82 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB82 Amended August 16, 2010
SB82 Amended June 14, 2010
SB82 Amended April 8, 2010
SB82 Amended September 4, 2009
SB82 Introduced January 20, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB82 Chaptered September 30, 2010
SB82 Enrolled August 31, 2010
SB82 Amended August 16, 2010
SB82 Amended June 14, 2010
SB82 Amended April 8, 2010
SB82 Amended September 4, 2009
SB82 Introduced January 20, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare