|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 482, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4646.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/12/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6178.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 22.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Heard in committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
To Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 0. Page 3482.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading. To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 3427.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2010
|
Set for hearing May 3.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 3184.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 3003.) Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/11/2010
|
Set for hearing March 23. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 8. Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/05/2010
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|