California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB962 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 5, 2010

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2010

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2010

Amended

Bill August 2, 2010
Bill June 17, 2010
Bill April 20, 2010
Bill March 11, 2010