LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB962
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB962
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB962
Compare Versions
SB962 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB962 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB962 Amended August 2, 2010
SB962 Amended June 17, 2010
SB962 Amended April 20, 2010
SB962 Amended March 11, 2010
SB962 Introduced February 5, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB962 Chaptered September 29, 2010
SB962 Enrolled August 23, 2010
SB962 Amended August 2, 2010
SB962 Amended June 17, 2010
SB962 Amended April 20, 2010
SB962 Amended March 11, 2010
SB962 Introduced February 5, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare