|
09/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2010
|
To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Correctly enrolled. Held at Desk pursuant to Joint Rule 57.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 4909.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 6491.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 6519.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6439.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 5989.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/10/2010
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 14. Page 3733.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 3670.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2010
|
Set for hearing May 27. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2010
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2010
|
Set for hearing April 26.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 3162.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/08/2010
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
04/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/09/2010
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
|
|
|
|
02/08/2010
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|