LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB991
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB991
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB991
Compare Versions
SB991 Enrolled August 30, 2010
SB991 Amended August 20, 2010
SB991 Amended August 17, 2010
SB991 Amended August 2, 2010
SB991 Amended April 7, 2010
SB991 Introduced February 8, 2010
Version 1 (Old)
SB991 Enrolled August 30, 2010
SB991 Amended August 20, 2010
SB991 Amended August 17, 2010
SB991 Amended August 2, 2010
SB991 Amended April 7, 2010
SB991 Introduced February 8, 2010
Version 2 (New)
Compare