California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB991 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 08/30/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SB 991ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 25, 2010 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 23, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 20, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 17, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 2, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 7, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Wolk (Coauthors: Assembly Members Buchanan and Huber) FEBRUARY 8, 2010 An act relating to flood control, and making an appropriation therefor. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 991, Wolk. Flood control. Under existing law, various general obligation bond acts have been approved by the voters to provide funds for water projects, facilities, and programs. The Disaster Preparedness and Flood Prevention Bond Act of 2006, a bond act approved by the voters at the November 7, 2006, statewide general election, authorizes the issuance of bonds in the amount of $4,090,000,000 for the purposes of financing disaster preparedness and flood prevention projects. This bill, with regard to those bond funds, would appropriate $30,000,000 to the Department of Water Resources for flood protection projects that either improve the sustainability of the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta, implement specified flood management actions in the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta, or do both. Appropriation: yes. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. (a) Pursuant to Section 5096.821 of the Public Resources Code, the sum of thirty million dollars ($30,000,000) is appropriated from the Disaster Preparedness and Flood Prevention Bond Fund of 2006 to the Department of Water Resources for flood protection projects that do either or both of the following: (1) Improve the sustainability of the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta, including, but not limited to, projects that reduce the risk of levee failure that would jeopardize water conveyance. (2) Implement flood management actions in the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta before the adoption of the Central Valley Flood Protection Plan, as part of a multibenefit project that complements activities to be developed under the Central Valley Flood Protection Plan. Projects described in this paragraph shall be subject to Section 9613 of the Water Code. (b) The Department of Water Resources shall expedite the evaluation of nonurban levees on the west bank of the Sacramento River that protect unincorporated communities, and may study and implement a joint project with local government agencies for improving flood bypass facilities as multibenefit flood control facilities, to the extent that those projects are consistent with adopted state policies.