California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR54 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 17, 2009

Enrolled

Bill August 10, 2010

Chaptered

Bill August 11, 2010

Amended

Bill May 25, 2010
Bill April 21, 2010