LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SCR54
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SCR54
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SCR54
Compare Versions
SCR54 Chaptered August 11, 2010
SCR54 Enrolled August 10, 2010
SCR54 Amended May 25, 2010
SCR54 Amended April 21, 2010
SCR54 Introduced August 17, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SCR54 Chaptered August 11, 2010
SCR54 Enrolled August 10, 2010
SCR54 Amended May 25, 2010
SCR54 Amended April 21, 2010
SCR54 Introduced August 17, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare