California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SCR54 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 08/11/2010

 BILL NUMBER: SCR 54CHAPTERED BILL TEXT RESOLUTION CHAPTER 79 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE AUGUST 11, 2010 ADOPTED IN SENATE AUGUST 9, 2010 ADOPTED IN ASSEMBLY AUGUST 2, 2010 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2010 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 21, 2010 INTRODUCED BY Senator Cogdill (Principal coauthor: Senator Denham) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bill Berryhill and Tom Berryhill) AUGUST 17, 2009 Relative to the R. Kirk Lindsey Memorial Highway. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SCR 54, Cogdill. R. Kirk Lindsey Memorial Highway. This measure would designate a specified portion of State Highway Route 108 in Modesto as the R. Kirk Lindsey Memorial Highway. This measure would also request the Department of Transportation to determine the cost of appropriate signs showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources covering those costs, to erect those signs. WHEREAS, On June 10, 2009, California lost one of its most highly regarded and renowned public leaders, R. Kirk Lindsey, whose indomitable spirit, forthright and honest demeanor, and fine personal example were an inspiration to the people throughout the State of California and the nation; and WHEREAS, A 1969 graduate of Abilene Christian College with a Bachelor of Science degree in business, R. Kirk Lindsey attended graduate school at Abilene Christian College and went on to earn a Master of Business Administration degree from Pepperdine University; and WHEREAS, R. Kirk Lindsey served his country with honor and distinction in the United States Army for almost four years beginning in 1969 and was honorably discharged at the rank of Captain; and WHEREAS, He became the Superintendent of Seattle Stevedore Company in 1972, and later brought immense credit and distinction to himself as Managing Partner of B & P Bulk, partner of P & L Properties, salesperson for Federal Crop Insurance Corporation, and owner of Pizza Machine, Cable Car Food & Deli, and Saratoga Travel; and WHEREAS, R. Kirk Lindsey created a legacy of community involvement and civic concern that will long inspire citizens of his community and beyond, he served as the girls' aquatics coach for swimming and water polo at Beyer High School for over 20 years; and WHEREAS, He was appointed to the California Transportation Commission (CTC) in 2000, and served two four-year terms during which he upheld CTC's mission to enhance the economic, social, and environmental welfare of all Californians by providing for a comprehensive, multimodal state transportation system that is consistent and compatible with orderly economic and social progress of the state; and WHEREAS, In addition to his professional responsibilities, R. Kirk Lindsey was active in the community as a member of numerous local and statewide boards, associations, commissions, and professional organizations; and WHEREAS, On June 11, 2009, Governor Arnold Schwarzenegger, First Lady Maria Shriver, and Senator Dave Cogdill offered statements of their condolences to R. Kirk Lindsey's family and commended him for his great works and contributions to the State of California; and WHEREAS, R. Kirk Lindsey leaves to mourn his passing and celebrate his legacy his wife, Cyndi, his four daughters, and his grandson; and WHEREAS, Senators Dave Cogdill and Jeff Denham and Assembly Members Tom Berryhill and Bill Berryhill express their deepest sympathy at the passing of R. Kirk Lindsey, and memorialize him for his illustrious record of personal, professional, public, and civic achievements, as well as the love and devotion he gave to his family and friends, for which it would be a fitting tribute to designate a portion of State Highway Route 108 in Modesto as the R. Kirk Lindsey Memorial Highway; now, therefore, be it Resolved by the Senate of the State of California, the Assembly thereof concurring, That the Legislature hereby designates the portion of State Highway Route 108 beginning in Modesto at Five Points (J Street, Needham Street, Downey Avenue, McHenry Avenue, and 17th Street) continuing east to Riverbank as the R. Kirk Lindsey Memorial Highway; and be it further Resolved, That the Department of Transportation is requested to determine the cost of appropriate signs consistent with the signing requirements for the state highway system showing this special designation and, upon receiving donations from nonstate sources sufficient to cover the cost, to erect those signs; and be it further Resolved, That the Secretary of the Senate transmit copies of this resolution to the Department of Transportation and to the author for appropriate distribution.