|
07/05/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4280.).
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2011
|
Read third time. Urgency clause refused adoption. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2407.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Simitian. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2407.)
|
|
|
|
09/07/2011
|
From committee: Return to Senate floor for consideration. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (September 7). Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/06/2011
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2011
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/11/2011
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2011
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2011
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1510.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2011
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 18).
|
|
|
|
05/11/2011
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2011
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 26). Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/14/2011
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/20/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 22.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|