California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB1019 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 18, 2011

Enrolled

Bill July 5, 2012

Chaptered

Bill July 17, 2012

Amended

Bill June 27, 2012
Bill September 2, 2011
Bill April 14, 2011