LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB1019
Compare Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB1019
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB1019
Compare Versions
AB1019 Chaptered July 17, 2012
AB1019 Enrolled July 5, 2012
AB1019 Amended June 27, 2012
AB1019 Amended September 2, 2011
AB1019 Amended April 14, 2011
AB1019 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 1 (Old)
AB1019 Chaptered July 17, 2012
AB1019 Enrolled July 5, 2012
AB1019 Amended June 27, 2012
AB1019 Amended September 2, 2011
AB1019 Amended April 14, 2011
AB1019 Introduced February 18, 2011
Version 2 (New)
Compare